MA S1888 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1871
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishing a sick leave bank for Jessica Culver, an employee of the Department of Mental Health (Senate, No. 1871),- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 1888).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jessica Culver, an employee of the Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 144 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-11-18 | House | Enacted |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-11-13 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-11-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-10-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Substituted for S1871 |
2013-10-21 | Senate | New draft of S1871 |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1871 (Replaces) 2013-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S1888
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1888 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1888.pdf |