MA S1888 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Foxborough to sell by auction town property located at 40 School Street. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received].
Title
To authorize the town of Foxborough to sell by auction town property located at 40 School Street
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2011-03-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1888 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15102&generalCourtId=1 |