MA S1885 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported by S2052
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Reported by S2052
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to veterans’ allowances, labor, outreach, and recognition,-- being the text of (Senate, No. 1878, printed as amended).
Title
Relative to veterans’ allowances, labor, outreach, and recognition
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported by S2052 |
2013-11-07 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Basile-Dempsey-Harrington), in concurrence |
2013-11-07 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Committee of conference (Rush-Brewer-Tarr) appointed |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendments |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-31 | House | Passed to be engrossed, as amended (for text of House amendment see H3735) |
2013-10-31 | House | Further amendment adopted, preculding vote |
2013-10-31 | House | Amendment 27 pending |
2013-10-31 | House | Further amendment adopted, preculding vote |
2013-10-31 | House | Amendment 17 pending |
2013-10-31 | House | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2013-10-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 242) |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 29 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 26 adopted, as changed |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 17 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 27 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 24 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 23 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 22 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 16 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 9 laid aside |
2013-10-30 | House | Decision of the Chair sustained on appeal 126 YEAS to 29 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 241) |
2013-10-30 | House | Point of Order well taken |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 9 pending |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 11 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 10 adopted, as changed |
2013-10-30 | House | Amendment 4 adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2013-10-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-28 | House | Amendment adopted, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means, see H3720 |
2013-10-28 | House | Read second |
2013-10-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2013-10-28 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2013-10-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H3720 |
2013-10-24 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-10-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #194 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Text of S1878, printed as amended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1885 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1885.pdf |