MA S1876 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to freeze the tolls on the Massachusetts turnpike and the metropolitan highway system. Transportation.
Title
Freezing the tolls on the Massachusetts turnpike and the metropolitan highway system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2387 |
2016-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/29/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S150 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
S1106 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1397 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S582 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S920 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S744 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S755 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S150 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2124
S1106 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1397 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S582 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S920 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S744 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1876 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1876.pdf |