MA S184 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the security of personal financial information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the security of personal financial information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-10-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S940 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S545 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S124 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1572 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1243 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S416 (Similar To) 2015-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1955
S132 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H1369 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S545 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S124 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1572 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1243 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S416 (Similar To) 2015-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1955
S132 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H1369 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S184.pdf |