MA H1369 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reporting of recidivism reducing program outcomes by the Department of Correction. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the recidivism reducing program reporting by the Commissioner of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1360 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H868 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H398 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2530 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1361 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1369 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1369.pdf |