MA S1835 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - See H3492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - See H3492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendment Title: Text of the Senate Ways and Means amendment to the House Bill financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents The committee on Senate Ways and Means, to whom was referred the House Bill financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents (House, No. 3492, amended) (the committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and States Assets having recommended that the bill be amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of Senate document numbered 1829); reports, recommending that the Bonding, Capital Expenditures and States Assets pending new text be amended by striking out the text and inserting in place thereof the text of Senate document numbered 1835.
Title
Text of the Senate Ways and Means amendment to the House Bill financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | See H3492 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Substituted as a new text for H3492 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | For text of S1835, printed as amended by the Senate, see S1845 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Pending Senate Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #40 (Brewer) adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Hedlund) adopted, as amended |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #28.1 (Donnelly) adopted - Roll Call #149 [YEAS 31 - NAYS 7] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Hedlund) pending |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #11.1 (Knapik) rejected |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Tarr) laid aside |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Eldridge) adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rush) adopted - Roll Call #148 [YEAS 23 - NAYS 15] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #1.1 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #147 [YEAS 16 - NAYS 22] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rush) pending |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #39 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #38 (Michael Moore) rejected |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #36 (Creem) rejected |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #35 (Candaras) adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #34 (Candaras) adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #33 (Welch) adopted |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #146 [YEAS 8 - NAYS 32] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | No action on amendment #32 (Hedlund) |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Motion to reconsider amendment #32 (Hedlund) negatived - Roll Call #145 [YEAS 4 - NAYS 35] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #144 [YEAS 8 - NAYS 31] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #143 [YEAS 13 - NAYS 26] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table negatived |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and laid over until the next session |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Motion to postpone until July 30, 2013 negative - Roll Call #126 [YEAS 4 - NAYS 35] |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #30 (Hedlund) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #29 (Hedlund) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Timilty) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #23 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #22 (Wolf) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Wolf) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Wolf) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Rosenberg) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Lovely) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Pacheco) rejected |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Montigny) rejected |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2013-07-23 | Senate | New text of H3492 |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1835 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1835.pdf |