MA S1807 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to equity in public contracting in honor of Bruce C. Bolling. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to equity in public contracting in honor of Bruce C. Bolling
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4239 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2717 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4239
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1220 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1325 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1634 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
H3942 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H4239 (Replaced by) 2020-02-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2717 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4239
S1708 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1220 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1325 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1634 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
H3942 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H4239 (Replaced by) 2020-02-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1807 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1807.pdf |