MA H3942 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to deeds excise receipts. Revenue.
Title
Relative to restoring equity in deeds excise allocation
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1634 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
H44 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S579 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2177
H44 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S579 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3942.pdf |