MA S1802 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for 3rd party expert evaluation of scope of practice legislation. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for third party expert evaluation of scope of practice legislation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2569 |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1853 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2674 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2674 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1802 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1802.pdf |