MA H2674 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local impacts of enacted legislation. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to local impacts of enacted legislation
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1853 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2674 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2674.pdf |