MA S18 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to voting rights. Election Laws.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to voting rights
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2021-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H74 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
S1003 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S28 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Hearing scheduled from 03/4/2021 @ 4:00 PM until 03/08/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Written Testimony Only
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1617 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1489 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S968 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S473 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H837 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1003 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S28 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Hearing scheduled from 03/4/2021 @ 4:00 PM until 03/08/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Written Testimony Only
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H3983 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1617 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1489 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1616 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S968 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S473 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H837 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S18 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S18.pdf |