MA S1799 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the imposition of an excise tax to provide for climate change adaptation infrastructure and affordable housing investments in the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Providing for climate change adaptation infrastructure and affordable housing investments in the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1799 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1799.pdf |