MA S1794 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the veteran allowance for public retirees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the veteran allowance for public retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseAccompanied H2749
2021-09-21JointHearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2749 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2455 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4441 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Committee of conference appointed - (Wagner-McMurtry-DeCoste)

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback