MA S1758 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S388
Note: Legislation replaced by S2303
Note: Legislation replaced by S2303
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act further regulating mercury management The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill prohibiting the sale, installation and disposal of mercury thermostats(Senate, No. 388); reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled "An Act further regulating mercury management" (Senate, No. 1758)
Title
Further regulating mercury management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2303 |
2013-12-12 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Gobi-Story-Gifford), in concurrence |
2013-12-12 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Committee of conference (Brewer-Flanagan-Hedlund) appointed |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendments |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-07-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-30 | House | Amendment 2 adopted, as changed |
2013-07-30 | House | Read third |
2013-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-30 | House | Amendment adopted, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means, see H3601 |
2013-07-30 | House | Read second |
2013-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2013-07-29 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2013-07-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H3601 |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #17 [36 Yeas - 0 Nays] |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read third |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Substituted, as a new draft for S388 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Pacheco) adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S388 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S388 (Replaces) 2013-03-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S1758
S2303 (Replaced by) 2014-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2014
S2303 (Replaced by) 2014-07-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1758 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1758.pdf |