MA S388 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H802
Note: Replaces legislation H828
Note: Replaces legislation H828
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S1758
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S1758
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the sale, installation and disposal of mercury thermostats. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Prohibiting the sale, installation and disposal of mercury thermostats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | New draft substituted, as amended, see S1758 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read second |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S1758 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Accompanied by H802 and H828 |
2013-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2013 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S388 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S388.pdf |