MA S1707 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H2477

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the establishment of a mean tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the establishment of a mean tested senior citizen property tax exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseAccompanied H2477
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2399 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2505 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2389 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2634 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1746 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H602 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H2657 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2392 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4469
H2470 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2477
S1604 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H2477 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback