MA S169 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit inhumane feline declawing. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Prohibiting inhumane feline declawing
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S169 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S169.pdf |