MA S1683 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2679

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide fair and affordable public retiree benefits. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide fair and affordable public retiree benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2679
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2623 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S895 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S882 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback