MA S1676 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2610
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to define employees in Group 2. Public Service.
Title
Relative to defining employees in Group 2
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2610 |
2023-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2372 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2377
S2525 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2024
S2537 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the , Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2024
S2610 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported (in part) by S1614
S2525 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2024
S2537 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the , Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2024
S2610 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported (in part) by S1614
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1676 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1676.pdf |