MA S2537 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Danielle Marie Cruz, an employee of the trial court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Danielle Marie Cruz, an employee of the trial court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2024
2024-02-20SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2024-02-20HouseEnacted
2024-02-20SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2024-02-20HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2024-02-15HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-29HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-01-29HouseRules suspended
2024-01-29HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-01-25HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-01-22SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-22SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2024-01-02SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2024-01-02SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2023-12-21HouseHouse concurred
2023-11-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2023-11-13SenateRules suspended
2023-11-02SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4539 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
H5053 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2957 (Similar To) 2024-10-10 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2965
S2986 (Similar To) 2024-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2024

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback