MA S1665 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to taxes due upon the death of active duty personnel and the elderly. Revenue.
Title
Relative to taxes due upon the death of active duty personnel and the elderly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H2595 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S353 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S783 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2529
H4244 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 357 of the Acts of 2020
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H2595 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S353 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1765 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1702 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S783 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2529
H4244 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 357 of the Acts of 2020
S2439 (Similar To) 2020-07-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1665 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1665.pdf |