MA S1652 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce the costs for adoption. Revenue.
Title
Reducing the costs for adoption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1929 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1925
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S710 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1084 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
H798 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S1235 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2433
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1492 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S710 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1084 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S561 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
H798 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S1235 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2433
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1652 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1652.pdf |