MA S1235 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to step therapy and patient safety. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to step therapy and patient safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-08SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1213 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1255 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S669 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1853 (Similar To) 2019-08-15 - Senate concurred
S843 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2004 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback