MA S1588 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to safety of officers by requiring interior lights in automobiles to be on during stops. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to safety of officers by requiring interior lights in automobiles to be on during stops

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-21SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-04-25HouseHouse concurred
2024-04-16SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-04HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-25SenateReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-12-04JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H4028 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4041 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2024
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback