MA S1587 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2497
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to sales tax exemptions for libraries. Revenue.
Title
Relative to sales tax exemptions for libraries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2497 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1608 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S1656 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1612 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3916
S1513 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S713 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1606 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2497 (Replaced by) 2018-07-25 - Reported (in part) by S1507
S1608 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S1656 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1612 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3916
S1513 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S713 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1522 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1606 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2497 (Replaced by) 2018-07-25 - Reported (in part) by S1507
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1587 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1587.pdf |