MA S1567 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Resolve reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Moore, a petition of Michael O. Moore that provisions be made for an investigation and study by a special commission to study technology to monitor and protect individuals in law enforcement custody. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a special commission to study technology to monitor and protect individuals in law enforcement custody

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-20SenateResolve reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-04-25HouseHouse concurred
2024-04-16SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-04HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-25SenateReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-12-04JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1747 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - House concurred
H2606 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H1534 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4505 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback