MA S1559 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2510
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect and enhance the rights of child and adult victims and witnesses of crime
Title
To protect and enhance the rights of child and adult victims and witnesses of crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2510 | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 7, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2510 (Replaced by) 2010-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S1559 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1833&generalCourtId=2 |