MA S154 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to nature of alcohol licenses and permits. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to nature of alcohol licenses and permits
Sponsors
Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-01-31 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S492 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H3984 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4467
H4467 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2772 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3984 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4467
H4467 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2772 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S154 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S154.pdf |