MA S1537 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide volunteer firefighters with a local option real estate tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Providing volunteer firefighters and emergency medical technicians with a local option real estate tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #293 [Yeas 36 - Nays 0] |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S485 (Similar To) 2016-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2448
S132 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H2537 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4032
S1424 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S131 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2377
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1388 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2268 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2016
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1393 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1439 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2158
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S132 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H2537 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4032
S1424 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S131 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2377
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1388 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2268 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2016
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1393 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1439 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2158
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1537 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1537.pdf |