MA S1505 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2545

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the conversion of certain disability retirements of public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the conversion of certain disability retirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2545
2019-09-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2342 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2372 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1595 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback