MA S1500 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to homeowners associations. Revenue.
Title
Relative to homeowners associations
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1349 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1608 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S228 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S621 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1897 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1349 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1608 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S228 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S621 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1897 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1500.pdf |