MA S15 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lewis (by request), a petition of Vincent Lawrence Dixon for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for term renewal process. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for term renewal process
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Petition filed |
Same As/Similar To
H82 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H3276 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S949 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S979 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2374 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3928 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3276 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S949 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S979 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2374 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3928 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S15 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S15.pdf |