MA H3276 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for the training, continuing training, and education of judges and other legal hearing officers. The Judiciary.
Title
For providing for the training, continuing training, and education of judges, and other legal hearing officers
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-11-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2958 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1694 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H82 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S1310 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H475 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4292
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1694 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H82 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S1310 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1307 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2692
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H475 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4292
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3276.pdf |