MA S1499 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the Borderland State Park trust fund. Revenue.
Title
Creating the Borderland State Park trust fund
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1348 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1469 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1348 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1469 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1499 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1499.pdf |