MA S1493 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4062
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove the sales tax exemption for soft drinks. Revenue.
Title
Removing the sales tax exemption for soft drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4062 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1635 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1608 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
S1643 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1561 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1534 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1511 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1672 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1492 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3907
H4062 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
S1635 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1608 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
S1643 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1498 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1561 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1484 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1534 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1511 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1672 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1492 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3907
H4062 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1493 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1493.pdf |