MA S1491 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the disclosure of public funding. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Requiring the disclosure of public funding
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4143 |
2013-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2013 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1491 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1491.pdf |