MA S1489 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3052
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3052
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3052
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve outcomes for sudden cardiac arrest. Public Health.
Title
Relative to improving outcomes for sudden cardiac arrest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S3052 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2386 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
S1536 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1527 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S3052 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1536 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H2339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1527 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S3052 (Replaced by) 2022-08-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1489 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1489.pdf |