MA S1484 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a municipal gas tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a municipal gas tax reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. James Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S2507 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1537 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1583 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2164 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2268 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2016
S1413 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1454 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1411 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1449 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2507 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1537 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1583 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2164 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2268 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2016
S1413 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1454 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1411 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1449 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1484.pdf |