MA S1467 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2648

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a commission on quality patient outcomes and nurse staffing. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission on quality patient outcomes and nurse staffing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2648
2023-09-08JointHearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-07-21JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2023-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2648 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4753 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback