MA S1466 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2892
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-23 - Accompanied H2892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-23 - Accompanied H2892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain parcel in the City of Cambridge as the Lynch Family Skate Park . State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating a certain parcel in the City of Cambridge as the Lynch Family Skate Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Accompanied H2892 |
2013-07-11 | House | Accompanied H2892 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2892 (Replaced by) 2013-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2013
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1466 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1466.pdf |