MA S1463 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further the success of opiate intervention programs. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to furthering the success of opiate intervention programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1379 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1884 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1711 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1257 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H1711 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1151 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1884 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1711 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1257 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H1711 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1151 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1747 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4538
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1463.pdf |