MA S1450 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to calculate income for the senior citizen circuit breaker tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the calculation of income for the senior citizen circuit breaker tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1457 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1483 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1445 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1452 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1464 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3770
S1457 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1483 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1445 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1452 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1464 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1450.pdf |