MA S1424 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H850
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied H850
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Accompanied H850
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote humane cosmetics and other household products by limiting the use of animal testing. Public Health.
Title
Promoting humane cosmetics and other household products by limiting the use of animal testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Accompanied H850 |
2024-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-14 | House | House concurred |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S580 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2729
S1126 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H850 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2757 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2908
H4915 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2024
S2908 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1126 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H850 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2757 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2908
H4915 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2024
S2908 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1424.pdf |