MA S1404 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Freetown to designate a check-off on its tax bills. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Freetown to designate a check-off on its tax bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-07-17 | House | Enacted |
2013-07-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-06-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day |
2013-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1404 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1404.pdf |