MA S1392 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public safety in excavation. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to public safety in excavation
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1614 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4125
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2815 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4125 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2815 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4125 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1392 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1392.pdf |