MA S136 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restore contract rights to craft brewers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Restoring contract rights to craft brewers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill substituted for report |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to lay on table negatived |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to substitute bill for the report |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S155 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1020 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1866 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1744 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S568 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S506 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1745 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H190 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1684 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1020 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1866 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1744 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S568 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S506 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1745 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H190 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1684 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S136.pdf |