MA S1354 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fees for seniors filing with the tax appellate board. Revenue.
Title
Relative to fees for seniors filing with the appellate tax board.
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2239 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2239 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1354 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1354.pdf |