MA S1334 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4101
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to accelerate improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to accelerating improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4101 |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2204 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101
H4101 (Replaced by) 2023-10-30 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4101 (Replaced by) 2023-10-30 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1334.pdf |