MA S1332 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2863
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety. Public Health.
Title
Relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2863 |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new text, see S2863 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S134 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1706 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S165 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1222 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1864
H889 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H1979 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3873 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2863 (Replaced by) 2020-07-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1706 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S165 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H244 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1222 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1864
H889 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5116
H1979 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3873 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2863 (Replaced by) 2020-07-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1332 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1332.pdf |